EP0321815 - Process for the preparation of etherified methylol alkyl ureas, dispersions and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.1993 [1993/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfersee Chemie GmbH Postfach 11 53 86460 Langweid a. Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | For all designated states Pfersee Chemie GmbH Postfach 11 53 D-86460 Langweid a. Lech / DE | ||
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states Chemische Fabrik Pfersee GmbH Postfach 11 53, Rehlinger Strasse 1 D-86460 Langweid / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sandner, Bernhard Ortlerweg 12 D-8901 Diedorf / DE | 02 /
Mangold, Rudolf Eichenstrasse 6 D-8901 Adelsried / DE | [1989/26] | Application number, filing date | 88120703.9 | 10.12.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | DE19873743539 | 22.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3743539 | [1989/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0321815 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0321815 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C127/15, D06M15/423 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
D06M15/423 (EP);
C07C273/1854 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von veretherten Methylolalkylharnstoffen, die daraus hergestellten Dispersionen und deren Verwendung | [1989/26] | English: | Process for the preparation of etherified methylol alkyl ureas, dispersions and use thereof | [1989/26] | French: | Procédé de préparation de méthylolalcoylurées étherifiées leur dispersion et utilisation | [1989/26] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 08.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/27] | 11.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2320302 |