EP0321834 - Centrifugal tumbling grinding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 24.04.1991 [1991/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Kurt Walther GmbH & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 43-51 Postfach 11 06 42 42306 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states Carl Kurt Walther GmbH & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 43-51 Postfach 11 06 42 D-42306 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Temme, Karl Westfalenweg 116 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Rieder, Hans-Joachim, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Postfach 11 04 51 42304 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Rieder, Hans-Joachim, Dr., et al Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Postfach 11 04 51 D-42304 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120803.7 | 13.12.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | DE19873743161 | 19.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3743161 | [1989/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0321834 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0321834 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B24B31/108 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
B24B31/108 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1989/26] | Title | German: | Fliehkraft-Gleitschleifmaschine | [1989/26] | English: | Centrifugal tumbling grinding machine | [1989/26] | French: | Machine de tribo-finition centrifuge | [1989/26] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 05.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/10] | 16.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]JP63100198 ; | [X]FR508602 (CLAY ET PIERRON); | [A]US4177608 (BALZ GUNTHER W [US]) | [YP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, Nr. 344 (C-528)[3191], 16. September 1988; & JP-A-63 100 198 (SANKO SETSUBI KOGYO K.K.) 02-05-1988, & JP63100198 A 00000000 |