EP0326689 - Safety flap for the handrail of an escalator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 24.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thyssen-M.A.N. Aufzüge GmbH Bernhäuserstrasse 45 73765 Neuhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states Thyssen-M.A.N. Aufzüge GmbH Bernhäuserstrasse 45 D-73765 Neuhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henning, Gunter, Dipl.-Ing. Deefenallee 23 D-2000 Oststeinbek / DE | [1989/32] | Representative(s) | Schaefer, Konrad Schaefer Emmel Hausfeld Patentanwälte Krohnstieg 43 22415 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | Schaefer, Konrad, Dipl.-Phys. Schaefer & Emmel Gehölzweg 20 D-22043 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120853.2 | 14.12.1988 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | DE19883802983 | 02.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3802983 | [1989/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0326689 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0326689 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B66B29/04 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
B66B29/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1989/32] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsklappe für den Handlaufeinlauf einer Fahrtreppe | [1989/32] | English: | Safety flap for the handrail of an escalator | [1989/32] | French: | Volet de sécurité pour main courante d'escalier roulant | [1989/32] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 30.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3809206 (BREDEHORN F, et al); | [A]US3934699 (SAITO CHUICHI, et al); | [A]AT352005B (SP K BJURO ESKALATOROSTROENIA [SU]) |