EP0322671 - Composite roughening and retroreflecting element consisting of a cluster, for horizontal road markings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.1992 [1992/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427, 2501 Hudson Road, Building 220, 12W01 St. Paul, Minnesota 55144 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427, 2501 Hudson Road, Building 220, 12W01 St. Paul, Minnesota 55144 / US | ||
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states Eigenmann, Ludwig, Dr. Via Dufour 3 CH-6900 Lugano / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eigenmann, Ludwig Dr. Via Dufour 3 CH-6900 Lugano / CH | [1990/03] |
Former [1989/27] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Madgwick, Paul Roland, et al Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Madgwick, Paul Roland, et al Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/27] | Haibach, Tino, Dr. Patentanwälte Wallach, Koch, Dr. Haibach, Feldkamp P.O. Box 121120 D-8000 München 12 / DE | Application number, filing date | 88121015.7 | 15.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | CH19870005063 | 24.12.1987 Original published format: CH 506387 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0322671 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0322671 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E01F9/04 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
B29D11/00615 (EP);
E01F9/506 (EP);
E01F9/524 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1989/27] | Title | German: | Zusammengesetztes, aufrauhendes und rückstrahlendes, aus einer Zusammenballung bestehendes Element für Wegoberflächenmarkierungen | [1989/27] | English: | Composite roughening and retroreflecting element consisting of a cluster, for horizontal road markings | [1989/27] | French: | Elément composite antidérapant et rétroréfléchissant, consistant en un conglomérat, pour marques routières horizontales | [1989/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 01.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/33] | 16.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]NL7401088 (EIGENMANN LUDWIG); | [AL]US3746425 ; | [X]FR2014295 ; | [A]CH475426 ; | [X]US3894791 ; | [AD]US3958891 ; | [ADL]US3782843 ; | [A]US4020211 ; | [A]US3253146 ; | [A]FR2222489 |