EP0323598 - Apparatus for scaling teeth and lavage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENTSPLY MANAGEMENT CORP. 570 West College Avenue York Pennsylvania 17405 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | For all designated states DENTSPLY MANAGEMENT CORP. 570 West College Avenue York Pennsylvania 17405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Warrin, George E. 914 Madison Place North Merrick, NY 11556 / US | 02 /
Perdreaux, Rene J. 11-91 East 34th Street Brooklyn, NY 11210 / US | [1989/28] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88121158.5 | 16.12.1988 | [1989/28] | Priority number, date | US19880141355 | 06.01.1988 Original published format: US 141355 | US19880157814 | 18.02.1988 Original published format: US 157814 | [1989/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0323598 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0323598 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323598 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61C17/02 | [1989/28] | CPC: |
A61C1/0084 (EP);
A61C17/20 (EP);
B23Q1/0036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/28] | Title | German: | Gerät zum Entfernen von Zahnstein und zum Spülen | [1989/28] | English: | Apparatus for scaling teeth and lavage | [1989/28] | French: | Appareil pour l'élimination du tartre et pour le lavage | [1989/28] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/46] | 15.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.04.1996 | BE | 24.04.1996 | ES | 24.04.1996 | GR | 24.04.1996 | IT | 24.04.1996 | NL | 24.04.1996 | SE | 24.07.1996 | LU | 31.12.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 24.04.1996 | |
BE | 24.04.1996 | ||
ES | 24.04.1996 | ||
GR | 24.04.1996 | ||
IT | 24.04.1996 | ||
SE | 24.07.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 24.04.1996 | |
BE | 24.04.1996 | ||
GR | 24.04.1996 | ||
IT | 24.04.1996 | ||
SE | 24.07.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 24.04.1996 | |
BE | 24.04.1996 | ||
IT | 24.04.1996 | ||
SE | 24.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/20] | AT | 24.04.1996 | |
BE | 24.04.1996 | ||
SE | 24.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 24.04.1996 | |
SE | 24.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | SE | 24.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US336280 ; | [A]AT180356B (MEYER-SALADIN OSKAR EMANUEL DR [CH]); | [A]DE7002091U (BANDELIN ELECTRONIC KG [DE]); | [A]US3707037 (GUTRIS GIORGIO); | [Y]US3718973 (SLATER R, et al); | [Y]US3924335 (BALAMUTH LEWIS, et al); | [A]GB1469399 (HALSTEAD J); | [A]WO8704613 (NAT PATENT DENTAL PROD [US]) |