EP0322690 - Thermoplastic polycarbonates and blends with enhanced flame retardant properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.12.1992 [1992/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILES INC. One Mellon Center 500 Grant St. Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2502 / US | [1992/37] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states MOBAY CORPORATION Patent Department Mobay Road Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15205-9741 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paul, Winfried, G. c/o MOBAY CORPORATION Bldg. 8 Mobay Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | 02 /
Price, Ronald, L. 271 Fernwood Avenue Woodland Estates Weirton, W.VA. 26062 / US | 03 /
Krishnan, Sivaram 1853 Little Meadow Road Pittsburgh, PA 15241 / US | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Gremm, Joachim, et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Gremm, Joachim, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 88121185.8 | 17.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | US19870138982 | 29.12.1987 Original published format: US 138982 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0322690 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/00, C08L83/10, C08K3/16 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
C08K3/24 (EP,US);
C08K3/16 (EP,US);
C08K3/26 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/16, C08L83/10 (EP,US);
C08K3/24, C08L83/10 (US,EP);
C08K3/26, C08L83/10 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/27] | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Polycarbonate und Zusammensetzungen mit erhöhten flammhemmenden Eigenschaften | [1989/27] | English: | Thermoplastic polycarbonates and blends with enhanced flame retardant properties | [1989/27] | French: | Polycarbonates thermoplastiques et des compositions avec des propriétés retardatrice de feu | [1989/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 21.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2154783 (BAYER AG); | [A]US3742083 (BIALOUS C); | [X]US4157997 (BOPP RICHARD C [US], et al) |