EP0322705 - Heat Pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sunwell Engineering Company Limited 18 Killaloe Road Unit 4 Concord Ontario, L4K 1C8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states Sunwell Engineering Company Limited 18 Killaloe Road Unit 4 Concord Ontario, L4K 1C8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldstein, Vlad 120 Torresdale Avenue Apt. 814 Willowdale Ontario M2R 3N7 / CA | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr., et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 88121257.5 | 31.08.1984 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | US19840631952 | 17.07.1984 Original published format: US 631952 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0322705 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0322705 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322705 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F25B29/00, F25C1/00, F25D17/02 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
F28F19/008 (EP);
F25D16/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Wärmepumpe | [1989/27] | English: | Heat Pump | [1989/27] | French: | Pompe à chaleur | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 29.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP84305987.4 / EP0168537 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.12.1995
19.12.1995
ADMISSIBLE Fehler, Kevan 40 Ossulton Way LONDON, N2 0DS / GB | [1996/04] | 11.12.1995 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 19.12.1995 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 09.01.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.07.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.07.1996 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 04.11.1996 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 07.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.10.1997 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 17.10.1997 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1998/12] | Request for further processing for: | 23.02.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 02.03.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.03.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 19.12.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.1989 | 19.12.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.1989 | 19.12.1988 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.1989 | 31.08.1992 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.1995 | CH | 08.03.1995 | IT | 08.03.1995 | LI | 08.03.1995 | NL | 08.03.1995 | SE | 08.06.1995 | LU | 31.08.1995 | [2007/52] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 08.03.1995 | |
CH | 08.03.1995 | ||
IT | 08.03.1995 | ||
LI | 08.03.1995 | ||
NL | 08.03.1995 | ||
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
LU | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 08.03.1995 | |
CH | 08.03.1995 | ||
IT | 08.03.1995 | ||
LI | 08.03.1995 | ||
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
LU | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 08.03.1995 | |
CH | 08.03.1995 | ||
IT | 08.03.1995 | ||
LI | 08.03.1995 | ||
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 08.03.1995 | |
CH | 08.03.1995 | ||
LI | 08.03.1995 | ||
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 08.03.1995 | |
CH | 08.03.1995 | ||
LI | 08.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/36] | CH | 08.03.1995 | |
LI | 08.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR754096 ; | [A]DE599649 (SIEMENS AG); | [X]US2101953 (ERIK OMAN); | [Y]GB668001 (SABROE & CO AS THOMAS THS); | [A]GB736186 (OHIO COMMW ENG CO); | [Y]DE1451094 (MILCHWERKE BIELEFELD HERFORD E); | [A]DE2900372 (SIMON LASZLO); | [A]FR2491607 (ALFA LAVAL CIE AGRI COOL [FR]); | [A]US4334412 (WILDFEUER ROBERT); | [E]US4509344 (LUDWIGSEN JOHN S [US], et al) |