EP0321966 - Thioesters and process for their production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.1992 [1992/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LONZA AG Gampel/Wallis Münchenerstrasse 38 CH-4002 Basel / CH | [1989/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huwiler, Alfred, Dr. Sennjistrasse Baltschieder (Kanton Wallis) / CH | 02 /
Abächerli, Claudio, Dr. Sandstrasse 5 Visp (Kanton Wallis) / CH | 03 /
Squaratti, Armand Chemin des Bousses Granges (Kanton Wallis) / CH | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Weinhold, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Weinhold, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88121440.7 | 21.12.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | CH19870005015 | 23.12.1987 Original published format: CH 501587 | [1989/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0321966 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/40 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
C07D277/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/26] | Title | German: | Thioester und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1989/26] | English: | Thioesters and process for their production | [1989/26] | French: | Thioesters et procédé pour leur production | [1989/26] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/09] | 15.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/43] | 27.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0185221 [ ]; | EP0272827 [ ]; | EP0096296 [ ] |