EP0324968 - Water containing, hardenable foamed materials of inorganic constituents and process for their manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1990 | Change - miscellaneous | published on 01.08.1990 [1990/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÜLS TROISDORF AG D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | [1990/12] |
Former [1990/11] | For all designated states Bergwerksverband GmbH Franz-Fischer-Weg 61 D-45307 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states Bergwerksverband GmbH Franz-Fischer-Weg 61 D-45307 Essen / DE | ||
For all designated states HÜLS TROISDORF AG D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Frank, Dr. Bogenstrasse 10 D-4300 Essen 15 / DE | 02 /
Mehesch, Hans, Dr. Frillendorfer Höhe 38 D-4300 Essen 1 / DE | 03 /
Cornely, Wolfgang, Dr. Lohstrasse 30 D-4390 Gladbeck / DE | 04 /
Fischer, Martin Siepenstrasse 4 D-4200 Oberhausen / DE | 05 /
Riecks, Birgit Bentheimer Strasse 4 D-4300 Essen 1 / DE | 06 /
Neuschäffer, Karlheinz, Dr. Böttnerstrasse 6 D-5653 Leichlingen / DE | [1989/30] | Application number, filing date | 88121489.4 | 22.12.1988 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | DE19873744210 | 24.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3744210 | [1989/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0324968 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/26, C04B38/02, // (C04B28/26, 14:30, 18:06, 18:14, 22:06, 22:08, 22:14, 24:16) | [1989/30] | CPC: |
C04B24/16 (EP);
C04B22/087 (EP);
C04B22/14 (EP);
C04B28/006 (EP);
C04B28/008 (EP);
C04B28/26 (EP);
C04B38/02 (EP);
C04B2111/00724 (EP);
Y02P40/10 (EP);
Y02W30/91 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/006, C04B12/04, C04B14/022, C04B14/303, C04B18/08, C04B18/146, C04B38/02, C04B40/0028, C04B2103/0095, C04B2103/0096 (EP);
C04B28/008, C04B14/303, C04B18/08, C04B22/08, C04B22/14, C04B38/02, C04B40/0028 (EP);
C04B28/26, C04B14/303, C04B18/08, C04B22/0013, C04B22/08, C04B38/02, C04B40/0028 (EP);
C04B28/26, C04B14/303, C04B18/08, C04B22/08, C04B22/14, C04B38/02, C04B40/0028 (EP);
C04B28/26, C04B14/303, C04B18/08, C04B22/08, C04B22/16, C04B38/02, C04B40/0028 (EP);
C04B28/26, C04B14/303, C04B18/08, C04B22/08, C04B24/16, C04B38/02, C04B40/0028 (EP); | Designated contracting states | ES [1989/30] | Title | German: | Wasserhaltige, härtbare Schaummassen aus anorganischen Bestandteilen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1989/30] | English: | Water containing, hardenable foamed materials of inorganic constituents and process for their manufacture | [1989/30] | French: | Mousse durcissable contenant de l'eau à base de constituants inorganiques et procédé de sa fabrication | [1989/30] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/31: Verfahren abgeschlossen infolge Verbindung mit 89901114.2/0374195 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) vom 13.06.90 | EPB 1990/31: Proceedings concluded following consolidation with 89901114.2/0374195 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 13.06.90 | EPB 1990/31: Procédure close par suite de la jonction avec la demande no. 89901114.2/0374195 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 13.06.90 | Examination procedure | 19.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3095312 (HOLMES SIDNEY T); | [Y]DE2227640 (BAYER AG); | [A]US3864137 (VAN BONIN WULF, et al); | [A]DE2525611 ; | [A]EP0111862 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]); | [A]DE3512588 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]); | [YD]EP0148280 ; | [AD]EP0199941 |