EP0322775 - Thrust-deflecting vane devices of v/stol aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1994 [1994/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2 Nishi Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2 Nishi Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamo, Keisuke c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku, 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Reichel, Wolfgang, et al 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Reichel, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Reichel und Reichel Parkstrasse 13 D-60322 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 88121541.2 | 23.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | JP19870328887 | 25.12.1987 Original published format: JP 32888787 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0322775 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0322775 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322775 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B64C15/02, B64C29/00 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
B64C29/0075 (EP,US);
B64C15/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/27] | Title | German: | Strahlablenkplattevorrichtung eines V/STOL-Flugzeuges | [1989/27] | English: | Thrust-deflecting vane devices of v/stol aircraft | [1989/27] | French: | Dispositif à volets déviateurs de la poussée d'un avion ADAV/ADAC | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 02.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/46] | Request for further processing for: | 13.02.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 07.02.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB927779 (LOCKHEED AIRCRAFT CORP); | [X]FR2079400 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | [A]US4116405 (BACCHI ANTHONY C, et al); | [A]US4296896 (KRESS ROBERT W, et al) |