EP0322926 - Assays utilizing improved chemiluminescent esters, thioesters and amides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nichols Institute Diagnostics 33051 Calle Aviador San Juan Capistrano, California 92675 / US | [1999/02] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states LONDON DIAGNOSTICS, INC. 10300 Valley View Road Suite No. 107 Eden Prairie Minnesota 55344 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCapra, Frank 26 Southdown Road Seaford East Sussex / GB | 02 /
Beheshti, Iraj 6540 Warren Avenue Edina, MN 55435 / US | 03 /
Hart, Russell C. 5608 Woodland Road Minnetonka, MN 55343 / US | 04 /
Koelling, Harlen 805 Juhl Avenue Waverly, IA 50677 / US | 05 /
Patel, Ashokkumar 13712 Stone Road Minnetonka, MN 55344 / US | 06 /
Ramakrishnan, Kastooriranganathan 2860 Evergreen Lane Plymouth, MN 55441 / US | [1999/32] |
Former [1989/27] | 01 /
McCapra, Frank 26 Southdown Road Seaford East Sussex / GB | ||
02 /
Beheshti, Iraj 6540 Warren Avenue Edina Minnesota 55435 / US | |||
03 /
Hart, Russell C. 5608 Woodland Road Minnetonka Minnesota 55343 / US | |||
04 /
Koelling, Harlen 805 Juhl Avenue Waverly Iowa 50677 / US | |||
05 /
Patel, Ashokkumar 13712 Stone Road Minnetonka Minnesota 55344 / US | |||
06 /
Ramakrishnan, Kastooriranganathan 2860 Evergreen Lane Plymouth Minnesota 55441 / US | Representative(s) | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [1998/47] | White, Martin Paul, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [1989/27] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88121915.8 | 30.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | US19870140040 | 31.12.1987 Original published format: US 140040 | US19880291843 | 29.12.1988 Original published format: US 291843 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0322926 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0322926 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322926 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0322926 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/58, G01N33/542 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
G01N33/53 (EP);
G01N33/542 (EP,KR);
C07D215/52 (EP);
C07D219/04 (EP);
C07D219/06 (EP);
C07D221/12 (EP);
C07D403/12 (EP);
C07J43/003 (EP);
G01N33/533 (EP);
G01N33/582 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Für Tests verwendbare chemilumineszierende Ester, Thioester und Amide | [1989/27] | English: | Assays utilizing improved chemiluminescent esters, thioesters and amides | [1989/27] | French: | Essais utilisant des esters, des thioesters et des amides chimioluminescents | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 19.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/47] | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 29.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 14.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98123411.5 / EP0916658 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.2000
ADMISSIBLE Molecular Light Technology Research Ltd. 5 Chiltern Close, Cardiff Industrial Park Cardiff CF4 5DL / GB Opponent's representative Newell, William Joseph Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Temple Court 13A Cathedral Road Cardiff CF11 9HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.2000
ADMISSIBLE Molecular Light Technology Research Ltd. 5 Chiltern Close, Cardiff Industrial Park Cardiff CF4 5DL / GB Opponent's representative Newell, William Joseph Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James Morgan Arcade Chambers 33 St. Mary Street Cardiff, CF1 2AB / GB | 09.06.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.02.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.12.2002 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.12.2002 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.11.2003 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | 14.12.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.01.1999 | Decision despatched | 16.03.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 14.03.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 26.04.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0257541 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0273115 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [E]EP0309230 (ML TECHNOLOGY VENTURES [US]) | [A] - CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 29, no. 8, August 1983, pages 1474-1479, Winston, US; I. WEEKS et al.: "Acridinium esters as high-specific-activity labels in immunoassay" | Examination | EP0263657 | Opposition | EP0082636 | EP0324202 | - McCapra et al. Proc.R.Soc.Lond.215.1982. pp 247-272 | - "The Acridines". A Albert, Edward Arnold. London 1966 | - "Comprehensive Chemical Kinetics", Ester Formation and Hydrolysis and related Reactions. | - March J., "Advanced Organic Chemistry : Reaction mechanisms and Structure" |