EP0324193 - Method and device for contact-free measuring the conductivity of a medium, using a capacitive coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.1990 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.1990 [1990/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yokogawa Electrofact B.V. Radiumweg 30 NL-3812 RA Amersfoort / NL | [1989/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Zoete, Marinus Cornelis Gerardus Graaf Janlaan 65 NL-3818 DX Amersfoort / NL | 02 /
Strihavka, Ivo Nieuwe Schans 80 NL-3751 BD Bunschoten Spakenburg / NL | [1989/29] | Representative(s) | de Wit, Gerard Frederik, et al Octrooi- en Merkenbureau de Wit B.V. Breitnerlaan 146 NL-2596 HG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/29] | de Wit, Gerard Frederik, Ir., et al Octrooi- en Merkenbureau de Wit B.V. Breitnerlaan 146 NL-2596 HG Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 88200040.9 | 13.01.1988 | [1989/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0324193 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/22 | [1989/29] | CPC: |
G01N27/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur kontaktlosen Messung der Leitfähigkeit eines Mediums durch kapazitive Ankopplung | [1989/29] | English: | Method and device for contact-free measuring the conductivity of a medium, using a capacitive coupling | [1989/29] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de mesure sans contact de la conductivité d'un milieu en utilisant un couplage capacitif | [1989/29] | File destroyed: | 29.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.01.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/36] | 11.04.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.02.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3443218 ; | [Y]DE1886329U ; | [A]US3408566 ; | [A]US3778707 ; | [T]GB2061528 |