EP0278542 - Preparation of tetrazole compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scott, Richard Mark Hamlet Court Hearts Delight Borden New Sittingbourne Kent / GB | 02 /
Fox, William 43 Glenfyan Avenue Cilbarchan Renfrewshire, Pa10 2JV / GB | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | ||
Former [1994/14] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1989/42] | Bennett, David Arthur Horder, et al 4, York Road London SE1 7NA / GB | ||
Former [1988/33] | Hunter, Keith Roger Ian Shell International Petroleum Company Limited, Intellectual Property Division, P.O. Box 662 London SE1 7NE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88200055.7 | 13.01.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | GB19870000748 | 14.01.1987 Original published format: GB 8700748 | [1988/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0278542 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0278542 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278542 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D257/04 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
C07D257/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Tetrazolderivaten | [1988/33] | English: | Preparation of tetrazole compounds | [1988/33] | French: | Préparation de dérivés de tétrazole | [1988/33] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 17.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR1451028 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [AD]EP0149269 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) | Examination | CA804030 |