EP0281188 - Laser diode control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.1995 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:BE
FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:BE
FR
GB
NL
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bathe, Paul, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Eckenhaiderhauptstrasse 62 D-8501 Eckental / DE | [1988/36] | Representative(s) | Peuckert, Hermann, et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | Peuckert, Hermann, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88200308.0 | 22.02.1988 | [1988/36] | Priority number, date | DE19873706572 | 28.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3706572 | [1988/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0281188 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0281188 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0281188 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/096, H01S3/133 | [1988/36] | CPC: |
H01S5/06209 (EP,US);
H01S5/06832 (EP,US);
H01S5/06812 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/36] | Title | German: | Regelung von Laserdioden | [1988/36] | English: | Laser diode control | [1988/36] | French: | Regulation d'un laser à diode | [1988/36] | Examination procedure | 03.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 10.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/36] | Request for further processing for: | 14.06.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 10.06.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.07.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.09.1994 | NL | 14.09.1994 | [1995/35] |
Former [1995/27] | BE | 14.09.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60031323 ; | [AD]EP0061034 (IBM [US]); | [A]US4355395 (SALTER STUART R, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 150 (E-324)[1873], 25. Juni 1985; & JP-A-60 031 323 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 18-02-1985, & JP60031323 A 00000000 |