EP0282132 - Compositions and their use for treating gastrointestinal disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/37] | Compositions and methods for treating gastrointestinal disorders | ||
[1992/40] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Place, Geoffrey 8690 Hollyhock Drive Cincinnati, OH 45231 / US | [1992/40] |
Former [1988/37] | 01 /
Place, Geoffrey 8690 Hollyhock Drive Cincinnati Ohio 45231 / US | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/22] | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1994/13] | De Minvielle-Devaux, Ian Benedict Peter, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1994/05] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney Procter & Gamble Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [1991/22] | L'Helgoualch, Jean Cabinet Sueur et L'Helgoualch 78, rue Carnot F-95240 Cormeilles-en-Parisis / FR | ||
Former [1989/32] | Suslic, Lydia Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [1988/37] | Ernst, Hubert PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 88200397.3 | 02.03.1988 | [1988/37] | Priority number, date | US19870023597 | 09.03.1987 Original published format: US 23597 | [1988/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0282132 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0282132 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282132 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/24, A61K31/415, A61K31/34, // (A61K33/24, 31:415),(A61K33/24, 31:345),(A61K31/415, 31:19),(A61K31/345, 31:19) | [1992/40] | CPC: |
A61K31/345 (EP,US);
A61K31/29 (KR);
A61K31/415 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/60 (EP,US);
A61K33/245 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/345, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/345, A61K31/19 (US,EP);
A61K31/415, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/415, A61K31/19 (US,EP);
A61K31/60, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/245, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [1988/37] | A61K33/24, A61K31/615, A61K31/415, A61K31/345, // (A61K33/24, 31:415),(A61K33/24, 31:345),(A61K31/415, 31:19),(A61K31/345, 31:19) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/37] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen und ihre Verwendung zur Behandlung von Magen-Darmstörungen | [1992/40] | English: | Compositions and their use for treating gastrointestinal disorders | [1992/40] | French: | Compositions et leur utilisation dans le traitement d'affections gastrointestinales | [1992/40] |
Former [1988/37] | Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Behandlung von Magen-Darmstörungen | ||
Former [1988/37] | Compositions and methods for treating gastrointestinal disorders | ||
Former [1988/37] | Composés et procédés de traitement d'affections gastrointestinales | Examination procedure | 08.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 14.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.1993
09.07.1993
ADMISSIBLE GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN England / GB Opponent's representative Caffin, Lee Glaxo Holdings plc Glaxo House Berkeley Avenue Greenford Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | 02
28.06.1993
09.07.1993
ADMISSIBLE SmithKline Beecham plc, Corporate Intellectual Property, SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middx. TW8 9BD / GB Opponent's representative Thompson, Clive Beresford GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.1993
09.07.1993
ADMISSIBLE GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN England / GB Opponent's representative Caffin, Lee Glaxo Holdings plc Glaxo House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | ||
02
28.06.1993
09.07.1993
ADMISSIBLE SmithKline Beecham plc, Corporate Intellectual Property, SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middx. TW8 9BD / GB Opponent's representative Thompson, Clive Beresford SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | |||
Former [1993/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.1993
09.07.1993
ADMISSIBLE GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN England / GB Opponent's representative Caffin, Lee Glaxo Holdings plc Glaxo House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | 14.07.1993 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 14.07.1993 | No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 26.07.1993 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 26.07.1993 | No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 04.08.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.04.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.01.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.02.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 26.02.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1999/25] | Appeal following opposition | 19.04.1995 | Appeal received No. T0317/95 | 23.06.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.02.1999 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 26.02.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.1999 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 30.09.1992 | |
LI | 30.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0206625 |