EP0318063 - Equipment for the actuation of needles for the realization of electric motors field windings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXIS S.p.A. 50028 Tavarnelle Val di Pesa (Firenze) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | For all designated states AXIS S.p.A. I-50028 Tavarnelle Val di Pesa (Firenze) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luciani, Sabatino Via di Querceto, 169 Firenze / IT | 02 /
Lumini, Antonio Via G. Leopardi, 9 Sesto Fiorentino FI / IT | [1989/22] | Representative(s) | Lotti, Giorgio c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Lotti, Giorgio c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 I-10128 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1992/39] | Lotti, Giorgio c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 I-10128 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1989/22] | Lotti, Giorgio c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 I-10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 88200431.0 | 08.03.1988 | [1989/22] | Priority number, date | IT19870068009 | 26.11.1987 Original published format: IT 6800987 | [1989/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0318063 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0318063 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/095 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
H02K15/095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1989/22] | Title | German: | Betätigungsgerät für Legenadeln zur Herstellung von Feldwindungen elektrischer Motoren | [1989/22] | English: | Equipment for the actuation of needles for the realization of electric motors field windings | [1989/22] | French: | Dispositif de mise en action des tubes de guidage pour la fabrication de bobinages de champ pour moteurs électriques | [1989/22] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 18.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP92119069.0 / EP0538905 | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 16.06.1993 | SE | 16.06.1993 | [2002/24] |
Former [1994/09] | SE | 16.06.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3025008 (NILL RICHARD G, et al); | [A]US3903593 (MASON LOWELL M); | [A]EP0209624 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) |