EP0284155 - Deflection unit for use in a projection television display tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1993 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sluyterman, Albertus Aemilius Seyno c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Vink, Nicolaas Gerrit c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1988/39] | Representative(s) | Koppen, Jan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | Koppen, Jan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 88200518.4 | 21.03.1988 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | NL19870000684 | 24.03.1987 Original published format: NL 8700684 | [1988/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0284155 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0284155 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/76 | [1988/39] | CPC: |
H01J29/762 (EP,US);
H01J29/70 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/39] | Title | German: | Ablenkeinheit zur Verwendung in einer Projektionsfernsehanzeigeröhre | [1988/39] | English: | Deflection unit for use in a projection television display tube | [1988/39] | French: | Unité de déflection pour utilisation dans un tube d'affichage de télévision par projection | [1988/39] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/20] | 18.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.06.1992 | ES | 10.06.1992 | IT | 10.06.1992 | NL | 10.06.1992 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 10.06.1992 | |
IT | 10.06.1992 | ||
NL | 10.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | AT | 10.06.1992 | |
NL | 10.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | NL | 10.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4420734 (SHIMIZU TOSHIHARU [JP], et al) |