EP0291120 - A regulated high frequency power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION 100 East 42nd Street 9th Floor New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION 100 East 42nd Street 9th Floor New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | ||
Former [1988/46] | For all designated states North American Philips Corporation 100 East 42nd Street 9th Floor New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wong, John M. c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Veenstra, Gustaaf, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | Veenstra, Gustaaf, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1988/46] | Zwaan, Andries Willem INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 88200878.2 | 04.05.1988 | [1988/46] | Priority number, date | US19870057394 | 11.05.1987 Original published format: US 57394 | [1988/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0291120 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0291120 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0291120 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/538 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
H02M7/5381 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/46] | Title | German: | Gesteuerte Hochfrequenzleistungsversorgung | [1988/46] | English: | A regulated high frequency power supply | [1988/46] | French: | Alimentation de puissance réglée à haute fréquence | [1988/46] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/23] | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 29.12.1993 | [1995/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0016537 (SPERRY CORP [US]); | [X]DE2941009 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [X]US4347560 (SEIERSEN OLE S) |