EP0292060 - Level indicator with front reading [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pirovano, Angelo Via Monte Bianco, 10 20011 Corbetta (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states Pirovano, Angelo Via Monte Bianco, 10 I-20011 Corbetta Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/47] | Representative(s) | Riccardi, Sergio IPSER Intellectual Property Services S.r.l. Via Sant'Orsola 4 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | Riccardi, Sergio Riccardi & Co. Via Macedonio Melloni, 32 I-20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88200962.4 | 13.05.1988 | [1988/47] | Priority number, date | IT19870020540 | 15.05.1987 Original published format: IT 2054087 | [1988/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0292060 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0292060 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/02, G01F23/38 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
G01F23/38 (EP);
F17C13/00 (EP);
F17C13/02 (EP);
G01F23/30 (EP);
F17C2201/054 (EP);
F17C2223/0153 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/47] | Title | German: | Füllstandsanzeiger mit stirnseitiger Ablesung | [1988/47] | English: | Level indicator with front reading | [1988/47] | French: | Indicateur de niveau avec lecture sur la face | [1988/47] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 08.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE326582 [ ] (AUGUST BITTERLING); | US2371511 [ ] (FAUS HAROLD T); | DE1186087 [ ] (HANS SIEBERT DIPL ING); | US3212333 [ ] (KAZUO TAYAMA) |