EP0311155 - Vibration isolating engine mount [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.1994 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707 M.S. 7E-25 Seattle Washington 98124-2207 / US | ||
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707 Mail Stop 7E-25 Seattle Washington 98124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clausen, Charles C. 341 N.W. 52nd Street Seattle, WA 98107 / US | 02 /
Johnson, Ronald C. 34026 S.E. 56th Street Fall City, WA 98024 / US | 03 /
Chee, Wan T. 13028 N.E. 32nd Place Bellevue, WA 98005 / US | 04 /
Schmidt, Warren E. 616 Rondeau Drive Erie, PA 16505 / US | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 88200976.4 | 16.05.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | US19870102045 | 29.09.1987 Original published format: US 102045 | [1989/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0311155 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0311155 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0311155 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B64D27/00, B64D29/06 | [1990/10] | CPC: |
B64D27/14 (EP,US);
B64D27/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/15] | B64D27/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/15] | Title | German: | Schwingungsdämpfungsbefestigung eines Triebwerks | [1989/15] | English: | Vibration isolating engine mount | [1989/15] | French: | Montage antivibration d'un moteur | [1989/15] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 05.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 30.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.03.1993 | IT | 24.03.1993 | NL | 24.03.1993 | GB | 24.06.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 24.03.1993 | |
NL | 24.03.1993 | ||
GB | 24.06.1993 | ||
FR | 13.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/41] | NL | 24.03.1993 | |
GB | 24.06.1993 | ||
FR | 13.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/24] | NL | 24.03.1993 | |
FR | 13.08.1993 | ||
Former [1993/51] | NL | 24.03.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1506083 (ROLLS ROYCE); | [A]US3809340 (BALANDIN J, et al); | [AD]US4044973 (MOOREHEAD JAMES R); | [A]GB2045357 (WESTLAND AIRCRAFT LTD); | [A]GB2049817 (ROLLS ROYCE) |