EP0294867 - A method of producing a colour picture tube screen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van der Waal, Jan c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1988/50] | Representative(s) | Koppen, Jan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | Koppen, Jan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1988/50] | Auwerda, Cornelis Petrus INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 88201018.4 | 20.05.1988 | [1988/50] | Priority number, date | GB19870012458 | 27.05.1987 Original published format: GB 8712458 | [1988/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0294867 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0294867 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/227 | [1988/50] | CPC: |
H01J9/2273 (EP,US);
H01J9/2272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines farbigen Bildröhrenschirms | [1988/50] | English: | A method of producing a colour picture tube screen | [1988/50] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un écran couleur pour tube à image | [1988/50] | Examination procedure | 08.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 09.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.04.1992 | FR | 01.04.1992 | NL | 01.04.1992 | ES | 12.07.1992 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/03] | AT | 01.04.1992 | |
NL | 01.04.1992 | ||
ES | 12.07.1992 | ||
FR | 21.08.1992 | ||
Former [1993/10] | AT | 01.04.1992 | |
NL | 01.04.1992 | ||
FR | 21.08.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | AT | 01.04.1992 | |
NL | 01.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | NL | 01.04.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2128606 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]FR2128607 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]US4052123 (YAMAZAKI EIICHI, et al) |