EP0294868 - Semiconductor device of the SOI type and method of manufacturing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.1993 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Widdershoven, Franciscus Petrus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1988/50] | Representative(s) | Veerman, Jan Willem, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Veerman, Jan Willem, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1992/09] | Jilderda, Anne Ayolt Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 P.O. Box 220 NL-5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1988/50] | Houbiers, Ernest Emile Marie Gerlach INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 88201023.4 | 20.05.1988 | [1988/50] | Priority number, date | NL19870001251 | 26.05.1987 Original published format: NL 8701251 | [1988/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0294868 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/74, H01L29/78, H01L29/10 | [1988/50] | CPC: |
H01L21/266 (EP,US);
H01L21/00 (KR);
H01L21/743 (EP,US);
H01L29/0684 (EP,US);
H01L29/10 (EP,US);
H01L29/1087 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/50] | Title | German: | SOI-Halbleiteranordnung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1988/50] | English: | Semiconductor device of the SOI type and method of manufacturing same | [1988/50] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur du type SOI et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1988/50] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 02.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/24] | 19.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/24] | 15.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59207640 ; | [A]JP5856352 ; | [A]JP56137674 ; | [A]JP5687340 ; | [A]US3925120 (SAIDA HIROJI, et al); | [A]US3879745 (THARMARATNAM POOTHATHAMBY); | [A]DE2641302 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4199773 (GOODMAN ALVIN M [US], et al); | [A]US4202002 (LA MONEDA F H DE [US]); | [A]EP0032022 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 69 (E-305), 29th March 1985, page 88 E 305; & JP-A-59 207 640 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 24-11-1984, & JP59207640 A 00000000 | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, vol. ED-24, no. 6, June 1977, pages 730-738, New York, US; D.J. McGREIVY: "On the origin of leakage currents in silicon-on-sapphire MOS transistors" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 144 (E-183), 23rd June 1983, page 30 E 183; & JP-A-58 56 352 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 04-04-1983, & JP5856352 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 16 (E-92), 29th January 1982, page 72 E 92; & JP-A-56 137 674 (CHO LSI GIJUTSU KENKYU KUMIAI) 27-10-1981, & JP56137674 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 159 (E-77), 14th October 1981, page 3 E 77; & JP-A-56 87 340 (FUJITSU K.K.) 15-07-1981, & JP5687340 A 00000000 |