EP0298534 - Coupling interposed between the rolls of a widener roller for sheet materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUYCK ITALIA S.p.A. Via Persicara 70 I-04100 Latina / IT | [1992/10] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states IRGA S.p.A. Via Boccaccio 15/A I-20123 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Lucchi, Cesare Viale XXIV Maggio 24 I-21013 Gallarate Varese / IT | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | De Carli, Erberto, et al ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | De Carli, Erberto, et al ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88201181.0 | 09.06.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | IT19870021218 | 08.07.1987 Original published format: IT 2121887 | [1989/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0298534 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0298534 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65H27/00, B65H23/34 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
B65H23/0258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/02] | Title | German: | Verbindung zwischen den Rollen einer Breitstreckwalze für blattförmiges Material | [1989/02] | English: | Coupling interposed between the rolls of a widener roller for sheet materials | [1989/02] | French: | Dispositif d'accouplement entre les bobines d'un rouleau déplisseur pour des matériaux en forme de feuilles | [1992/12] |
Former [1989/02] | Dispositif d'accouplement entre les bobines d'un roulleau déplisseur pour des matériaux en forme de feuilles | Examination procedure | 16.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 24.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.03.1992 | BE | 18.03.1992 | CH | 18.03.1992 | FR | 18.03.1992 | GR | 18.03.1992 | LI | 18.03.1992 | NL | 18.03.1992 | SE | 18.03.1992 | LU | 30.06.1992 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 18.03.1992 | |
BE | 18.03.1992 | ||
CH | 18.03.1992 | ||
GR | 18.03.1992 | ||
LI | 18.03.1992 | ||
NL | 18.03.1992 | ||
SE | 18.03.1992 | ||
LU | 30.06.1992 | ||
FR | 07.08.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 18.03.1992 | |
BE | 18.03.1992 | ||
CH | 18.03.1992 | ||
LI | 18.03.1992 | ||
NL | 18.03.1992 | ||
SE | 18.03.1992 | ||
LU | 30.06.1992 | ||
FR | 07.08.1992 | ||
Former [1993/10] | AT | 18.03.1992 | |
BE | 18.03.1992 | ||
CH | 18.03.1992 | ||
LI | 18.03.1992 | ||
NL | 18.03.1992 | ||
SE | 18.03.1992 | ||
FR | 07.08.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | AT | 18.03.1992 | |
BE | 18.03.1992 | ||
CH | 18.03.1992 | ||
LI | 18.03.1992 | ||
NL | 18.03.1992 | ||
SE | 18.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | BE | 18.03.1992 | |
CH | 18.03.1992 | ||
LI | 18.03.1992 | ||
NL | 18.03.1992 | ||
SE | 18.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/47] | CH | 18.03.1992 | |
LI | 18.03.1992 | ||
SE | 18.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | CH | 18.03.1992 | |
LI | 18.03.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2724620 [ ] (IRGA IND RESINE GOMME AFFINI S); | DE3311095 [ ] (WITTLER H GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | Examination | US4236285 |