EP0300561 - Method for producing superconducting oxides and thin films of such oxides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bhargava, Rameshwar Nath c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Osborne, William Noel c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Zwicker, Walter Karl c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1989/04] | Representative(s) | Pennings, Johannes, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | Pennings, Johannes, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 88201503.5 | 13.07.1988 | [1989/04] | Priority number, date | US19870075491 | 20.07.1987 Original published format: US 75491 | [1989/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0300561 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0300561 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0300561 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C01G3/00, C04B35/00, C23C18/12, H01L39/24 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
C01G3/006 (EP,US);
H10N60/0324 (EP,US);
C04B35/4508 (EP,US);
C23C18/1216 (EP,US);
C23C18/1254 (EP,US);
C23C18/1279 (EP,US);
C23C18/1283 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
Y10S505/734 (EP,US);
Y10S505/735 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/04] | H01L39/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von supraleitenden Oxiden und dünne Schichten aus diesen Oxiden | [1989/04] | English: | Method for producing superconducting oxides and thin films of such oxides | [1989/04] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'oxydes supraconducteurs et conclus minces de ces oxydes | [1989/04] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 08.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 06.04.1994 | [1995/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4636248 (OGATA YASUYUKI [JP], et al); | [E]EP0280292 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) |