EP0304113 - Starting material for permanent magnets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 25.09.1991 [1991/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Mooij, Dirk Bastiaan c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Van Mens, Reinoud c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Buschow, Kurt Heinz Jürgen c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1989/08] | Representative(s) | Pennings, Johannes, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | Pennings, Johannes, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 88201675.1 | 03.08.1988 | [1989/08] | Priority number, date | NL19870001970 | 21.08.1987 Original published format: NL 8701970 | [1989/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0304113 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/04 | [1989/08] | CPC: |
H01F1/032 (KR);
H01F1/058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/08] | Title | German: | Ausgangsmaterial für Dauermagneten | [1989/08] | English: | Starting material for permanent magnets | [1989/08] | French: | Matériau de déport pour des aimants permanents | [1989/08] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 11.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/40] | 26.07.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - MATERIALS LETTERS, Band 4, Nrs. 8,9, August 1986, Seiten 377-380, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., Amsterdam, NL; N.C. LIU et al.: "High coercivity permanent magnet materials based on iron-rare-earth-carbon alloys" | [ ] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, Band 61, Nr. 8, 15. April 1987, Seiten 3574-3576, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; N.C. LIU et al.: "High intrinsic coercivities in iron-rare earth-carbon-boron alloys through the carbide or boro-carbide Fe14R2X(X=BxC1-x)" |