EP0311191 - High-definition television picture transmission system using a relatively narrow band channel, and receiver and transmitter suitable therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE PHILIPS 3, Avenue Descartes 94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | For:DE
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/08] | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE PHILIPS 3, Avenue Descartes F-94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1989/15] | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE PHYSIQUE APPLIQUEE L.E.P. 3, Avenue Descartes F-94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fonsalas, Frédéric Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209 Rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 02 /
Hayet, Pascal Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209 Rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 03 /
Lejard, Jean-Yves Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209 Rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 04 /
Le Queau, Marcel Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209 Rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Chaffraix, Jean, et al Société Civile SPID, 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | Chaffraix, Jean, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88202133.0 | 29.09.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | FR19870013982 | 09.10.1987 Original published format: FR 8713982 | [1989/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0311191 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/00, H04N7/12 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
H04N7/125 (EP,US);
H04N7/08 (KR);
H04N7/0152 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/15] | Title | German: | Hochauflösendes Fernsehübertragungssystem mit relativ schmalbandigem Kanal und Fernsehempfänger und -sender dafür | [1989/15] | English: | High-definition television picture transmission system using a relatively narrow band channel, and receiver and transmitter suitable therefor | [1989/15] | French: | Système de transmission d'images à haute définition par un canal présentant une bande passante relativement étroite, ainsi qu'un récepteur et un émetteur convenant pour le système | [1989/15] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 08.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/38] | 29.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0146713 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP [JP]); | [A]US4605950 (GOLDBERG ABRAHAM A [US], et al) | [A] - FERNSEH & KINO-TECHNIK, vol. 41, no. 1/2, janvier/février 1987, pages 23-27,30-32, Heidelberg, DE; H. SAUERBURGER: "Breit- und schmalbandige kompatible einkanalige HDTV-ÜBERTRAGUNG | [AD] - N.H.K. LABORATORIES NOTE, no. 304, septembre 1984, pages 1-12, N.H.K., Tokyo, JP; Y. NINOMIYA et al.: "A single channel HDTV broadcast system - The muse" |