EP0313152 - Process for the chemical immobilization of biologically active substances on silica [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.1994 [1994/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENIRICERCHE S.p.A. Corso Venezia 16 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | For all designated states ENIRICERCHE S.p.A. Corso Venezia 16 I-20121 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Battilotti, Massimo Via Romolo Gigliozzi 53 I-00128 Tor de Cenci Rome / IT | 02 /
Colapicchioni, Claudio Via San Castulo 3 I-00182 Rome / IT | 03 /
Fiorini, Mario Viale Cortina d'Ampezzo 164 I-00135 Rome / IT | 04 /
Barbaro, Aurelio Via Madonna 2 Ponti I-00060 Capena Rome / IT | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | Roggero, Sergio, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | [1989/17] | Application number, filing date | 88202284.1 | 13.10.1988 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | IT19870022389 | 23.10.1987 Original published format: IT 2238987 | [1989/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0313152 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0313152 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0313152 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12N11/14, C12N11/02 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
C12N11/14 (EP);
G01N33/552 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur chemischen Immobilisation biologisch aktiver Substanzen auf Kieselerde | [1989/17] | English: | Process for the chemical immobilization of biologically active substances on silica | [1989/17] | French: | Procédé d'immobilisation chimique de substances biologiquement actives sur la silice | [1989/17] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 17.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3519538 (MESSING RALPH A, et al); | [AD]EP0207564 (ENIRICERCHE SPA [IT]); | [E]EP0291130 (ENIRICERCHE SPA [IT]) |