EP0317021 - One-way-valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1993 [1993/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WISA B.V. Driepoortenweg 5 NL-6827 BP Arnhem / NL | [1989/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hin, Theodoor Rene Maria Eusebiusbinnensingel 22 NL-6811 BX Arnhem / NL | [1989/21] | Representative(s) | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinkplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 88202553.9 | 15.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | NL19870002757 | 18.11.1987 Original published format: NL 8702757 | [1989/21] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0317021 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0317021 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16K47/00, F16K15/06 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
F16K47/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/21] | Title | German: | Rückschlagventil | [1989/21] | English: | One-way-valve | [1989/21] | French: | Clapet antiretour | [1989/21] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 06.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.12.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB618104 (FINNEY PRESSES LTD, et al); | [A]FR2285560 (BRAUKMANN ARMATUREN [CH]); | [X]US4693270 (YAINDL CHARLES [US]) |