EP0329863 - Compacting of a metal web [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.1993 [1993/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. BEKAERT S.A. Bekaertstraat 2 8550 Zwevegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states N.V. BEKAERT S.A. Bekaertstraat 2 B-8550 Zwevegem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Bruyne, Roger Paradijsstraat 9 B-9780 Zulte / BE | 02 /
Lefever, Ignace Pladijsstraat 220 B-8740 Deerlijk / BE | 03 /
Schepens, Hervé Kleine Ronsestraat 80A B-8562 Zwevegem-Otegem / BE | 04 /
Losfeld, Ronny Kuiperstraat 41 B-8790 Waregem / BE | [1989/35] | Application number, filing date | 88202616.4 | 22.11.1988 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | EP19870202635 | 29.12.1987 Original published format: EP 87202635 | [1989/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0329863 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0329863 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/04, B01D39/20, F23D14/16, B30B15/06 | [1989/35] | CPC: |
B01D39/2044 (EP,US);
B22F3/002 (EP,US);
B22F3/04 (EP,US);
F23D14/16 (EP,US);
F23D2203/105 (EP,US);
F23D2212/201 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/35] | Title | German: | Verdichtung eines Metallgewebes | [1989/35] | English: | Compacting of a metal web | [1989/35] | French: | Compression d'un tissu métallique | [1989/35] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/09] | 22.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB545620 (JOHN SHAW & SONS SALFORD LTD, et al); | [A]DE3429801 (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHF [DE]); | [A]US4629483 (STANTON ROBERT J [US]); | [A]EP0227131 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE]); | [A]EP0157432 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 91, no. 22, 26th November 1979, page 390, abstract no. 181415m, Columbus, Ohio, US; P. DUCHEYNE et al.: "Isostatically compacted metal fiber porous coatings for bone ingrowth", & POWDER METALL. INT. 1979, 11(3), 115-19 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 2, 14th July 1986, page 219, abstract no. 9929d, Columbus, Ohio, US; W.J. HUPPMANN et al.: "Cold isostatic pressing of stainless steel filter cartridges", & PROG. POWDER METALL. 1985 (PUB. 1986) 41, 579-88 |