EP0322947 - Composite laminate of metal sheets and continuous filaments-reinforced synthetic layers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Structural Laminates Company 510 Constitution Boulevard New Kensington, Pennsylvania 15068 / US | [1992/27] |
Former [1992/08] | For all designated states Structural Laminates Company 510 Constitution Boulevard New Kensington Pennsylvania 15068 / US | ||
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gunnink, Jan Willem Bilderdijkstraat 5 NL-2902 AA Kapelle aan de IJssel / NL | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department PO Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1993/18] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. APTA) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1992/08] | Sieders, René AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1989/35] | Sieders, René AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1989/27] | Sieders, René AKZO N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 88202812.9 | 08.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | NL19870003164 | 31.12.1987 Original published format: NL 8703164 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0322947 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322947 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B64C1/00, B32B15/08, B29C67/14 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/14 (US);
B32B15/20 (US);
B64C1/06 (EP,US);
B64C1/12 (EP,US);
B32B2260/021 (US);
B32B2260/046 (US);
B32B2305/08 (US);
B32B2307/54 (US);
B32B2398/20 (US);
B32B2605/18 (US);
B64C2001/0072 (EP,US);
B64C2001/0081 (EP,US);
Y02T50/40 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24091 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24099 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24132 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Zusammengestelltes Laminat aus Metallschichten und mit fortlaufenden Fäden verstärkte Kunststoffschichten | [1989/27] | English: | Composite laminate of metal sheets and continuous filaments-reinforced synthetic layers | [1989/27] | French: | Laminé composé de feuilles métalliques et de couches synthétiques, renforcées de filaments continus | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 20.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.07.1992 | BE | 15.07.1992 | CH | 15.07.1992 | ES | 15.07.1992 | GR | 15.07.1992 | IT | 15.07.1992 | LI | 15.07.1992 | SE | 15.07.1992 | LU | 31.12.1992 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 15.07.1992 | |
BE | 15.07.1992 | ||
CH | 15.07.1992 | ||
GR | 15.07.1992 | ||
IT | 15.07.1992 | ||
LI | 15.07.1992 | ||
SE | 15.07.1992 | ||
LU | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 15.07.1992 | |
BE | 15.07.1992 | ||
CH | 15.07.1992 | ||
IT | 15.07.1992 | ||
LI | 15.07.1992 | ||
SE | 15.07.1992 | ||
LU | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 15.07.1992 | |
BE | 15.07.1992 | ||
CH | 15.07.1992 | ||
IT | 15.07.1992 | ||
LI | 15.07.1992 | ||
SE | 15.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/16] | AT | 15.07.1992 | |
BE | 15.07.1992 | ||
CH | 15.07.1992 | ||
LI | 15.07.1992 | ||
SE | 15.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | AT | 15.07.1992 | |
CH | 15.07.1992 | ||
LI | 15.07.1992 | ||
SE | 15.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/11] | CH | 15.07.1992 | |
LI | 15.07.1992 | ||
SE | 15.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | CH | 15.07.1992 | |
LI | 15.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0056289 (DELFT TECH HOGESCHOOL [NL]) |