EP0275197 - Stepping motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1996 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 21.02.1996 [1996/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizutani, Minoru c/o Oki Electric Industry Co. Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Kuniharu c/o Oki Electric Industry Co. Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kikuchi, Hiroshi c/o Oki Electric Industry Co. Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Chiba, Naoki Tohoku Oki Electic Co. Ltd. 1 Tate Sasakino Fukushima-Shi Fukushima-Ken / JP | [1988/29] | Representative(s) | Boydell, John Christopher, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | Boydell, John Christopher, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 88300270.1 | 13.01.1988 | [1988/29] | Priority number, date | JP19870002918 | 14.01.1987 Original published format: JP 291887 | [1988/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0275197 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0275197 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0275197 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0275197 | Date: | 21.02.1996 | [1996/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02K37/14 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
H02K37/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1988/29] | Title | German: | Schrittschaltmotor | [1988/29] | English: | Stepping motor | [1988/29] | French: | Moteur pas à pas | [1988/29] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 13.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.10.1993
02.12.1993
ADMISSIBLE Fa. Berger Lahr GmbH Breslauerstrasse 7 77933 Lahr / DE Opponent's representative Maucher Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Urachstraße 23 79102 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.10.1993
02.12.1993
ADMISSIBLE Fa. Berger Lahr GmbH Breslauerstrasse 7 77933 Lahr / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Hans Schmitt Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Maucher Dreikönigstrasse 13 D-79102 Freiburg / DE | 07.12.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.04.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.05.1995 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.06.1995 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.12.1995 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1129522 (CONS ELECTRONICS IND); | [A]US3549918 (CROYMANS JACQUES JOHANNES HEND, et al); | [A]DE2613038 (FUJU ELECTROCHEMICAL CO) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 248 (E-431)(2304), 26th August 1986 JP-A-61 76059 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN |