EP0275214 - Programmable multiple pump medication infusion system with printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.1992 [1992/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACESETTER INFUSION LTD. 12884 Bradley Avenue Sylmar California 91342 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | For all designated states PACESETTER INFUSION LTD. 12884 Bradley Avenue Sylmar California 91342 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulman, Joseph H. 17222 Midwood Drive Granada Hills California 91344 / US | 02 /
Gorton, Lanny A. 10728 Wescott Avenue Sunland California 91040 / US | [1988/29] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 88300341.0 | 15.01.1988 | [1988/29] | Priority number, date | US19870003892 | 16.01.1987 Original published format: US 3892 | [1988/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0275214 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0275214 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0275214 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/14 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
A61M5/142 (EP,US);
A61M5/1413 (EP,US);
A61M5/16827 (EP,US);
A61M5/50 (EP,US);
Y10S128/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/29] | Title | German: | Programmierbares Infusionssystem mit Mehrfachpumpe und Druckereinheit | [1988/29] | English: | Programmable multiple pump medication infusion system with printer | [1988/29] | French: | Système d'infusion programmable à pompe multiple comprenant une imprimante | [1988/29] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 13.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2535974 (BIOENGINEERING RESEARCH); | [A]FR2364662 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR]); | [A]FR2458694 (LARIVIERE JEAN); | [Y]EP0120284 (XANTHOPOULOS PIRITHEOS ERIC); | [Y]DE3500467 (BERNARD GEB KAEMMERER INGRID [DE]) |