EP0279514 - High frequency heating apparatus using inverter-type power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maehara, Naoyoshi 385-75 Yao Tawaramotocho Shiki-gun Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Takahiro 8-9 Awa-3-chome Ikarugacho Ikoma-gun Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Sakamoto, Kazuho 24 Kitadani Umedani Kizucho Soraku-gun Kyoto / JP | 04 /
Niwa, Takashi 3-1 Okidome-5-Chome Ikarugacho Ikoma-gun Nara-ken / JP | 05 /
Shitaya, Takao 93-9 Yatayamacho Yamatokoriyama-shi / JP | 06 /
Bessyo, Daisuke Shoairyo 376 Tsutsuicho Yamatokoriyama-shi / JP | 07 /
Kusunoki, Shigeru 89-4 Yatayamacho Yamatokoriyama-shi / JP | [1988/34] | Representative(s) | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al F.J. Cleveland & Company 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al F.J. Cleveland & Company 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88300400.4 | 19.01.1988 | [1988/34] | Priority number, date | JP19870015509 | 26.01.1987 Original published format: JP 1550987 | [1988/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0279514 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0279514 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/68, F24C7/08, F24C7/02, H05B6/64 | [1988/34] | CPC: |
H05B6/666 (EP,US);
H05B6/64 (KR);
H05B6/68 (KR);
H05B6/685 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/34] | Title | German: | Hochfrequenzheizapparat mit Netzanschlussvorrichtung, die einen Wechselrichter aufweist | [1988/34] | English: | High frequency heating apparatus using inverter-type power supply | [1988/34] | French: | Appareil de chauffage à haute fréquence utilisant une alimentation en courant du type inverseur | [1988/34] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/09] | 14.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP53041842 [ ]; | JP52094547 [ ]; | JP52079342 [ ]; | JP52103739 [ ]; | JP53110142 [ ]; | JP53075546 [ ]; | JP52115446 [ ] | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, M Section, Vol. 2, No. 74, June 10, 1978 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 1824 M 78 & JP-A-53 041 842 (Matsushita), & JP53041842 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, M Section, Vol. 1, No. 151, December 6, 1977 The Patent Office Japenese Government page 5405 M 77 & JP-A-52 094 547 (Matsushita), & JP52094547 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, M Section, Vol. 1, No. 137, November 11, 1977 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 4813 M 77 & JP-A-52 079 342 (Matsushita), & JP52079342 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, M Section, Vol. 1, No. 158, December 15, 1977 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 5847 M 77 & JP-A-52 103 739 (Matsushita), & JP52103739 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined Applications, M Section, Vol. 2, No. 138, November 16, 1978 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 4700 M 78 & JP-A-53 110 142 (Matsushita), & JP53110142 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, M Section, Vol. 2, No. 107, September 6, 1978 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 3295 M 78 & JP-A-53 075 546 (Matsushita), & JP53075546 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, M Section, Vol. 2, No. 5, January 13, 1978 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 6390 M 77 & JP-A-52 115 446 (Hitachi), & JP52115446 A 00000000 |