EP0276955 - Continuous casting machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISHIKAWAJIMA-HARIMA JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-1, Ote-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON KOKAN KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states ISHIKAWAJIMA-HARIMA JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-1, Ote-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON KOKAN KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Shuzo No. 6-1-8-504, Konandai Konan-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Tsuchida, Yutaka No. 3-64-13, Kamoi Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Osada, Shiro No. 16-63, Nakao-cho Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Hasebe, Nobuhisa No. 2703-9, Iijima-cho Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 88300535.7 | 22.01.1988 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | JP19870020143 | 30.01.1987 Original published format: JP 2014387 | [1988/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0276955 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0276955 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0276955 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/06 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
B22D11/0608 (EP,US);
B22D11/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/31] | Title | German: | Stranggussmaschinen | [1988/31] | English: | Continuous casting machines | [1988/31] | French: | Machines de coulée continue | [1988/31] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/19] | 27.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61067544 ; | [A]GB759593 (JOSEPH BARRY BRENNAN); | [A]FR2502995 (VAYDA ALEXANDRE [CH]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 234 (M-507)[2290], 14th August 1986; & JP-A-61 067 544 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) 07-04-1986, & JP61067544 A 00000000 |