EP0280397 - Endoscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adair, Edwin L. 2800 S. University Blvd. 97 Denver Colorado 80210 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | For all designated states Adair, Edwin L. 2800 S. University Blvd. 97 Denver Colorado 80210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/35] | Representative(s) | Foster, David Martyn, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey Surrey KT16 8LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | Foster, David Martyn, et al MATHISEN MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88300562.1 | 25.01.1988 | [1988/35] | Priority number, date | US19870036553 | 09.04.1987 Original published format: US 36553 | US19870018630 | 25.02.1987 Original published format: US 18630 | [1988/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0280397 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0280397 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0280397 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B5/00 | [1988/35] | CPC: |
A61B1/00126 (EP,US);
A61B1/00128 (EP,US);
A61B1/042 (EP,US);
A61B1/317 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/35] | Title | German: | Endoskop | [1988/35] | English: | Endoscope | [1988/35] | French: | Endoscope | [1988/35] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/08] | 13.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | WO8605964 [ ] (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]); | DE2949422 [ ] (STORZ KARL FA [DE]); | US4589404 [ ] (BARATH JAMES D [US], et al); | DE3542761 [ ] (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]); | US4025776 [ ] (CAWOOD CHARLES DAVID, et al); | WO8300992 [ ] (CAWOOD CHARLES DAVID); | FR1027125 [ ] (CIE IND ET ARTISTIQUE DES MATI) | Examination | GB2126717 | WO8404665 |