EP0278624 - Dry separation of solids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.1991 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | [1988/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lupton, John Maxwell 93 Barrowby Road Grantham Lincolnshire NG 31 8AE / GB | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Neville, Peter Warwick Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | Neville, Peter Warwick Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 88300620.7 | 26.01.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | GB19870002166 | 30.01.1987 Original published format: GB 8702166 | GB19870009501 | 22.04.1987 Original published format: GB 8709501 | [1988/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0278624 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278624 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B03B5/46 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
B03B5/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1988/33] | Title | German: | Trockene Abtrennung von Feststoffen | [1988/33] | English: | Dry separation of solids | [1988/33] | French: | Séparation à sec de solides | [1988/33] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/01] | 21.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4035288 (GIBERT FRANCOIS, et al); | [A]DE2848474 (CABLE COMMUNICATION ACCESS); | [A]US3444996 (DOUGLAS EDWARD, et al); | [AD]GB1085810 (NAT RES DEV) |