EP0277747 - Process for production of eicosapentaenoic acid from algae [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1992 | Change - applicant | published on 01.07.1992 [1992/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNTORY LIMITED 1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8203 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states SUNTORY LIMITED 1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 530 / JP | ||
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states Suntory Limited 1-40 Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinmen, Yoshifumi S-304, 8-1 Enmyojitoriimae Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Hideaki 19-1, Matsugasakikinomoto-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Shimizu, Sakayu 14, Nishinokyohakuraku-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London ECV 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 88300631.4 | 26.01.1988 | [1988/32] | Priority number, date | JP19870015109 | 27.01.1987 Original published format: JP 1510987 | [1988/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0277747 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0277747 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/64, C12P7/62, C11C1/04 | [1988/32] | CPC: |
C12P7/6432 (EP,US);
C12P7/6472 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Eikosapentaensäure aus Algen | [1988/32] | English: | Process for production of eicosapentaenoic acid from algae | [1988/32] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'acide eicosapentaénoique à partir d'algues | [1988/32] | File destroyed: | 01.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 03.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/22] | 09.05.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP61031092 ; | [A]JP60087798 ; | [A]JP59204128 |