EP0283124 - Carrier device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3650 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60025-5811 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olsen, Robert Charles 6N240 James Court Medinah, Illinois / US | [1988/38] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88301142.1 | 11.02.1988 | [1988/38] | Priority number, date | US19870015998 | 18.02.1987 Original published format: US 15998 | [1988/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0283124 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0283124 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00 | [1988/38] | CPC: |
B65D71/504 (EP,US);
Y10S206/831 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/38] | Title | German: | Tragevorrichtung | [1988/38] | English: | Carrier device | [1988/38] | French: | Porte récipients | [1988/38] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/20] | 23.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3269530 (WANDERER HERBERT J); | [A]DE2012449 ; | [A]US3752305 (HEYNE C); | [A]FR2169442 (BALGROS JACQUES [FR]); | [A]US4462494 (CUNNINGHAM ERNEST R [US]) |