EP0289111 - Child resistant dispensing closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.1991 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.1992 [1992/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYTOP CORPORATION 110 Graham Drive Slatersville Rhode Island 02876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | For all designated states POLYTOP CORPORATION 110 Graham Drive Slatersville Rhode Island 02876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilson, Woodrow S. 3 Lakeshore Drive Johnston, Rhode Island 02919 / US | 02 /
La Vange, Donald White Hill Lane Cumberland, Rhode Island 02864 / US | [1988/44] | Representative(s) | Spence, Anne, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | Spence, Anne, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 88301295.7 | 17.02.1988 | [1988/44] | Priority number, date | US19870043783 | 29.04.1987 Original published format: US 43783 | [1988/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0289111 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0289111 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0289111 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/08, B65D55/02 | [1988/44] | CPC: |
B65D47/0838 (EP,US);
B65D50/045 (EP,US);
B65D2251/1016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/44] | Title | German: | Kindergesicherter Spenderverschluss | [1988/44] | English: | Child resistant dispensing closure | [1988/44] | French: | Fermeture dispensatrice résistante aux enfants | [1988/44] | Examination procedure | 03.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 03.05.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 07.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3830393 (SCHAEFER R); | [YD]US4010875 (BABIOL PIERRE); | [Y]FR2371352 (POLYTOP CORP [US]); | [YD]US4172540 (ERICHSON HERBERT [DE]); | [YD]US4513888 (CURRY JOHN J [US]); | [X]GB2166423 (JOHNSEN & JORGENSEN); | [YP]CH663396 (ALFATECHNIC AG) |