EP0280474 - Macromolecular platinum antitumor compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHNSON MATTHEY, INC. 4 Malin Road Malvern Pennsylvania 19355 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | For all designated states JOHNSON MATTHEY, INC. 4 Malin Road Malvern Pennsylvania 19355 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Serino, Anthony J. 1143 Pynchon Hall Road West Chester Pennsylvania 19382 / US | 02 /
Henson, Geoffrey W. 81 Devon Drive Exton Pennsylvania 19341 / US | 03 /
Schwartz, David A. 122 Princeton Road Exton Pennsylvania 19341 / US | 04 /
Picker, Donald H. 405 Merwyn Merian Pennsylvania 19066 / US | [1988/35] | Representative(s) | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyers Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 88301410.2 | 19.02.1988 | [1988/35] | Priority number, date | US19870018715 | 25.02.1987 Original published format: US 18715 | [1988/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0280474 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0280474 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0280474 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/36, A61K39/395, A61K49/02 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
A61K47/6803 (EP,US);
A61K47/61 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/35] | A61K47/00, A61K39/395, A61K49/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/35] | Title | German: | Makromolekulare Platin-Antitumorverbindungen | [1988/35] | English: | Macromolecular platinum antitumor compounds | [1988/35] | French: | Composés de platine macromoléculaires antitumoraux | [1988/35] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/37] | 24.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0088695 (CYTOGEN CORP [US]); | [X]EP0111388 (INCO RES & DEV CENTER INC [US]) | Examination | EP0099133 |