EP0329870 - A device for transferring a lithographic plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO. 17-96, Tsurumi 4-chome Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO. 17-96, Tsurumi 4-chome Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yagushi, Akio c/o Tsubakimoto Chain Co. 77-88 Tsurumi 4-Chome Tsurumi-Ku Osaka-shi / JP | 02 /
Kyoo, Takatsugo c/o Tsubakimoto Chain Co. 77-88 Tsurumi 4-Chome Tsurumi-Ku Osaka-shi / JP | [1989/35] | Representative(s) | Meddle, Alan L., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Meddle, Alan Leonard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88301546.3 | 23.02.1988 | [1989/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0329870 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0329870 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/12 | [1989/35] | CPC: |
B41F27/1206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1989/35] | Title | German: | Transfersystem für lithographische Druckplatten | [1989/35] | English: | A device for transferring a lithographic plate | [1989/35] | French: | Dispositif de transfert d'une plaque lithographique | [1989/35] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 11.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.06.1992 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4408530 (YANO TADASHI [JP], et al); | [A]DE3630876 (TOKYO KIKAI SEISAKUSHO LTD [JP]) |