EP0285249 - Latent electrostatic image developing device and toner cartridge used therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.1994 [1994/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITA INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri Higashi-ku Osaka 540 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | For all designated states MITA INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri Higashi-ku Osaka 540 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyoshi, Yoshitake 8-17 Nagamodai 13-chome Kamo-cho Souraku-gun Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Shibata, Kiyotaka Heights, Rm 300 3-16-10G Tonda-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1988/40] | Representative(s) | Huntingford, David Ian, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | Huntingford, David Ian, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 88301555.4 | 24.02.1988 | [1988/40] | Priority number, date | JP19870030158 | 02.03.1987 Original published format: JP 3015887 | JP19870098219 | 26.06.1987 Original published format: JP 9821987 | [1988/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0285249 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0285249 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [1988/40] | CPC: |
G03G15/06 (KR);
G03G15/0855 (EP,US);
G03G15/0865 (EP,US);
G03G15/0875 (EP,US);
G03G15/0882 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0687 (EP,US);
Y10S222/01 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/40] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entwickeln eines latenten elektrostatischen Bildes und Tonerpatrone für solche Vorrichtung | [1988/40] | English: | Latent electrostatic image developing device and toner cartridge used therein | [1988/40] | French: | Dispositif de développement d'une image latente électrostatique et récipient de toner utilisé dans ce dispositif | [1988/40] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1993/02: Teilanmeldung 91202782.8 eingereicht am 24/02/88 | EPB 1993/02: Divisional application 91202782.8 filed on 24/02/88 | EPB 1993/02: Demande divisionnaire 91202782.8 déposée le 24/02/88 | Examination procedure | 30.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 18.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP91202782.8 / EP0470675 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61170760 ; | [X]US4062385 (KATUSHA JEROME MARK, et al); | [A]EP0101303 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]EP0102002 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 380 (P-528)[2437], 19th December 1986; & JP-A-61 170 760 (MITA IND CO. LTD) 01-08-1986 (Cat. D,A), & JP61170760 A 00000000 |