EP0283182 - Microwave ovens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.1992 [1992/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW WORLD DOMESTIC APPLIANCES LIMITED New World House Thelwall Lane Warrington WA4 1NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | For all designated states New World Domestic Appliances Limited New World House Thelwall Lane Warrington WA4 1NL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whittaker, Gary 19A Keyes Close, Oakwood Warrington, Cheshire / GB | 02 /
Andrews, Gordon 1 Montague Terrace, Durham Road Bromley, Kent / GB | [1988/38] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Brian Richard 59 Shenfield Place Shenfield Brentwood Essex CM15 9AH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | Lawrence, Brian Richard 59 Shenfield Place Shenfield Brentwood Essex CM15 9AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88301959.8 | 07.03.1988 | [1988/38] | Priority number, date | GB19870005596 | 10.03.1987 Original published format: GB 8705596 | [1988/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0283182 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/68 | [1988/38] | CPC: |
H05B6/645 (EP);
H05B6/6482 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, SE [1988/38] | Title | German: | Mikrowellenofen | [1988/38] | English: | Microwave ovens | [1988/38] | French: | Four à micro-ondes | [1988/38] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 29.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 18.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/06] | 30.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0187543 [ ]; | GB2042858 [ ]; | GB2168503 [ ]; | FR2335799 [ ]; | US3470942 [ ]; | GB2037100 [ ] |