EP0283183 - Film processing kit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.1992 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.1992 | Change - withdrawal | published on 13.05.1992 [1992/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Czumak, Frank M. 13 Dennison Avenue Salem New Hampshire 03079 / US | [1988/38] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88301964.8 | 07.03.1988 | [1988/38] | Priority number, date | US19870026689 | 17.03.1987 Original published format: US 26689 | [1988/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0283183 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0283183 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03D9/00 | [1988/38] | CPC: |
G03D9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1988/38] | Title | German: | Filmentwicklungsvorrichtung | [1988/38] | English: | Film processing kit | [1988/38] | French: | Dispositif de développement de film | [1988/38] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/17] | 10.03.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4607928 (NANGERONI ROBERT J [US]); | [A]US3453138 (CHEN RICHARD J, et al) |