EP0284334 - Rinse soluble polymer film composition for wash additives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Clorox Company 1221 Broadway Oakland, California 94612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | For all designated states The Clorox Company 1221 Broadway Oakland California 94612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, William L. 3525 Kings Canyon Court Pleasanton California 94566 / US | 02 /
Sudbury, Barry A. 1818 Halcyon Court Pleasanton California 94566 / US | 03 /
Kaufmann, Edward J. 3704 Andalucia Court San Ramon California 94583 / US | [1988/39] | Representative(s) | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 88302477.0 | 22.03.1988 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | US19870030196 | 24.03.1987 Original published format: US 30196 | [1988/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0284334 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0284334 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C08J5/18, C08L29/04 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
C11D17/0039 (EP,US);
C11D17/042 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/39] | C11D17/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/39] | Title | German: | Spülmittellösliche polymere Filmzusammensetzung für Waschzusätze | [1988/39] | English: | Rinse soluble polymer film composition for wash additives | [1988/39] | French: | Composition de rinçage soluble de polymère film pour additifs de lavage | [1988/39] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 13.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2132216 (UNILEVER NV); | [AD]US4098969 (ZIMMERMANN WOLFGANG, et al); | [Y]EP0158464 (CLOROX CO [US]); | [A]EP0180287 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) |