EP0288158 - Steam sauna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INAX CORPORATION 6 Koiehonmachi 3-chome Tokoname-Shi Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states INAX CORPORATION 6 Koiehonmachi 3-chome Tokoname-Shi Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakakibara, Shigeru Enokido Factory Inax Corporation 3-77 Minato-Cho Tokoname-Shi Aichi / JP | 02 /
Kawamoto, Ryuichi Enokido Factory Inax Corporation 3-77 Minato-Cho Tokoname-Shi Aichi / JP | [1988/43] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88302556.1 | 23.03.1988 | [1988/43] | Priority number, date | JP19870073820 | 26.03.1987 Original published format: JP 7382087 | [1988/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0288158 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0288158 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0288158 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61H33/06 | [1988/43] | CPC: |
A61H33/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61H33/063 (EP,US);
A61H2201/10 (EP,US);
A61N2005/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/43] | Title | German: | Dampfsauna | [1988/43] | English: | Steam sauna | [1988/43] | French: | Sauna à la vapeur | [1988/43] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 07.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU20754B ; | [A]GB2099695 (CAZALY ALLAN FRANCIS); | [A]DE3314617 (CONDAIR AG [CH]); | [A]EP0121500 (DELCO GUIDO); | [A]DE3516144 (KALWAR KLAUS [DE]) |