EP0285377 - Preparation of highly crystallized, molded polyarylene thioether products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUREHA KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-9-11, Nihonbashi, Horidome-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | For all designated states KUREHA KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-9-11, Nihonbashi, Horidome-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawakami, Yukichika 25-13 Negoya Ueda-machi Iwaki-shi Fukushima-ken / JP | 02 /
Iwasaki, Takao 119 Asahidai Kanayama-machi Iwaki-shi Fukushima-ken / JP | 03 /
Shiiki, Zenya 28-1 Ochiai Nishiki-machi Iwaki-shi Fukushima-ken / JP | [1988/40] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88302798.9 | 29.03.1988 | [1988/40] | Priority number, date | JP19870077022 | 30.03.1987 Original published format: JP 7702287 | [1988/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0285377 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0285377 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0285377 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29C71/00, C08J7/02, C08J5/18 | [1989/37] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08J3/00 (KR);
B29C55/005 (EP,US);
B29C67/24 (EP,US);
B29C71/0009 (EP,US);
B29C71/0063 (EP,US);
C08G75/0254 (US);
C08G75/0277 (EP,US);
C08G75/0281 (US);
C08G75/029 (EP,US);
C08J7/02 (EP,US);
D01F6/765 (EP,US);
B29C55/00 (EP,US);
B29C71/02 (EP,US);
B29K2081/00 (EP,US);
C08J2381/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1988/40] | B29C71/02, D01F6/66, C08J5/18, B29C55/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/40] | Title | German: | Herstellung von hoch-kristallisierten, geformten Polyarylenthioether-Produkten | [1988/40] | English: | Preparation of highly crystallized, molded polyarylene thioether products | [1988/40] | French: | Production de produits moulés de haute cristallinité en thioéther de polyarylène | [1988/40] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 02.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4299951 (CAMPBELL ROBERT W); | [A]US4629778 (SUGIE TOSHINORI [JP], et al); | [APD]EP0233494 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]); | [XE]EP0268489 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) |