EP0285399 - Floating mirror mount [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.1992 [1992/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spectra-Physics, Inc. 1335 Terra Bella Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | For all designated states Spectra-Physics Inc. 3333 North First Street San Jose California 95134-1995 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koop, Dale Edward 655 South Fair Oaks Avenue Apt.N214 Sunnyvale CA 94086 / US | [1988/40] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1988/40] | Ford, Michael Frederick MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 88302846.6 | 30.03.1988 | [1988/40] | Priority number, date | US19870032860 | 31.03.1987 Original published format: US 32860 | [1988/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0285399 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0285399 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/086, G02B7/18 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
H01S3/086 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/40] | H01S3/086 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/40] | Title | German: | Schwebende Spiegelhalterung | [1988/40] | English: | Floating mirror mount | [1988/40] | French: | Support pour miroir flottant | [1988/40] | File destroyed: | 15.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/13] | 29.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.08.1991 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3953113 (SHULL WILLIAM A); | [A]US4298248 (LAPP ROGER H); | [A]CH656233 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4648692 (KINOSHITA TSUYOSHI [JP]); | [A]US4673249 (SCHNEIDER HORST [DE], et al); | [AD]US4709372 (RANDO JOSEPH F [US], et al); | [A]US4807839 (NETTLETON JOHN E [US], et al); | [A]US4810079 (HARTLAGE JOHN J [US]) |