EP0285430 - Amorphous-polypropylene-based hot melt adhesive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.1994 [1994/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakabayashi, Toshinori c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co. 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33 427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Sugii, Shinji c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co. 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33 427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1988/40] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88302917.5 | 31.03.1988 | [1988/40] | Priority number, date | JP19870082778 | 03.04.1987 Original published format: JP 8277887 | [1988/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0285430 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0285430 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0285430 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09J123/12, C08L23/12, C08L53/02 | [1993/18] | CPC: |
C09J123/12 (EP);
C09J153/02 (EP);
C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L2666/04 (EP);
H05K3/303 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09J123/12, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C09J153/02, C08L2666/04 (EP) |
Former IPC [1991/13] | C09J3/14, C08L23/12, C08L53/02 | ||
Former IPC [1988/40] | C09J3/14, C08L23/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/40] | Title | German: | Heissschmelz-Klebstoff aus amorphem Polypropylen | [1988/40] | English: | Amorphous-polypropylene-based hot melt adhesive | [1988/40] | French: | Adhésif applicable à la chaleur à base de polypropylène amorphe | [1988/40] | Examination procedure | 02.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 14.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3686107 (RUSSELL THOMAS E) |