EP0291159 - Aminosalicylic-acid derivatives for the treatment of psoriasis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAK-LABORATORIET A/S Lergravsvej 59 DK-2300 Copenhagen / DK | [1988/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jorgensen, Anne Plough Brostykkevej 84 DK-2650 Hvidovre / DK | 02 /
Menne, Torkil Baunegaardsvej 57 DK-2900 Hellerup / DK | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Plougmann, Ole, et al Plougmann, Vingtoft & Partners, Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007 1021 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Plougmann, Ole, et al c/o Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S, Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007 DK-1021 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [1988/46] | Ritter, Stephen David Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 88302918.3 | 31.03.1988 | [1988/46] | Priority number, date | GB19870007739 | 01.04.1987 Original published format: GB 8707739 | DK19880000730 | 12.02.1988 Original published format: DK 73088 | [1988/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0291159 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0291159 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/60 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
A61K31/60 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | Aminosalicylsäure-Derivate zur Behandlung von Psoriasis | [1988/46] | English: | Aminosalicylic-acid derivatives for the treatment of psoriasis | [1988/46] | French: | Dérivés de l'acide aminosalicylique pour le traitement du psoriasis | [1988/46] | File destroyed: | 01.10.2001 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/13] | 26.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH342965 (DANIEWSKI WLODZIMIERZ DOC MGR [PL]); | [X]FR4546M ; | [X]GB1240545 (RESEARCH CORP [US]); | [A]FR2285140 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [X]US4036951 (HALPERN ALFRED, et al); | [X]US4056624 (LASSMAN HOWARD B, et al); | [X]GB2021409 (FISONS LTD); | [X]EP0062000 (STAFFORD MILLER CONTINENTAL NV [BE], et al); | [A]US4483854 (DIAMOND JULIUS [US]); | [Y]DE3413052 (RAFA LABOR LTD [IL]); | [X]EP0279093 (REID ROWELL INC [US]); | [T]EP0352826 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]) | [X] - DIGESTION, vol. 29, no. 4, 1984, pages 231-234, S. Karger AG, BaselDE; W.S. SELBY et al.: "Topical treatment of distal ulcerative colitis with 4-amino-salicylic acid enemas" | [X] - DIGESTION, vol. 29, no. 4, 1984, pages 204-208, S. Karger AG, BaselDE; M. CAMPIERI et al.: "A double-blind clinical trial to compare the effects of 4-aminosalicylic acid to 5-aminosalicylic acid in topical treatment of ulcerative colitis" | [X] - FARMATSIYA, vol. 27, no. 5, 1978pages 50-52; A.A. DANILENKO et al.: "Study of the possibility of sterilizing eye drops by the bacterial filtration method" | [X] - J. PHARMACOKINET. BIOPHARM., vol. 2, no. 1, 1974pages 1-12; S.H. WAN et al.: "Bioavailability studies on para-aminosalicylic acid and its various salts in man. I. Absorption from solution and suspension" | [X] - BRIT. J. DERMATOL., vol. 120, no. 3, March 1989pages 471-472; T. RANZI et al.: "Successful treatment of genital and oral ulceration in Behcet's disease with topical 5-aminosalicylic acid (5-ASA)" |